NY A10159 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.305 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.305 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | print number 10159a |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2016-05-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06669 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - referred to transportation