NY A10139 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the number of judges of the family court in certain counties.
Title
Relates to the number of judges of the family court in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | signed chap.44 |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1574 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7883 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.521 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.521 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07883 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10139