NY A10121 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - signed chap.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - signed chap.80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from July 1, 2016 to July 1, 2019, the expiration of provisions relating to the estate tax treatment of dispositions to a surviving spouse who is not a United States citizen.
Title
Extends from July 1, 2016 to July 1, 2019, the expiration of provisions relating to the estate tax treatment of dispositions to a surviving spouse who is not a United States citizen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | signed chap.80 |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1704 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7788 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.871 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07788 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10121