NY A10114 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7840
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7840
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of certain state officers and employees; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7840 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.517 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07840 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.182