NY A10091 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers to accept payments for coverage of health care from third parties.
Title
Requires health insurers to accept payments for coverage of health care from third parties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.576 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.576 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07500 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10091