NY A10071 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to judicial wellness and assistance committees.
Title
Relates to judicial wellness and assistance committees.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.356 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1127 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1606B |
2016-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.194 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.194 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01606 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10071