NY A10063 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to driving while using a portable electronic device; removes the requirement that there be reasonable cause a person using the device has committed a violation to issue a summons.
Title
Relates to driving while using a portable electronic device; removes the requirement that there be reasonable cause a person using the device has committed a violation to issue a summons.
Sponsors
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. David Gantt [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Mark Schroeder [D] |
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-07-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-07-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-07-01 | ordered to third reading rules cal.529 | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.529 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-11 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-03-02 | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S6992 (Same As) 2010-05-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING