NY A10050 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases, from $16,280,000,000 to $17,280,000,000, the bonding authorization granted to the New York state housing finance agency.
Title
Increases, from $16,280,000,000 to $17,280,000,000, the bonding authorization granted to the New York state housing finance agency.
Sponsors
Asm. Vito Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6899 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.126 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.126 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06899 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.419