NY S06899 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases, from $16,280,000,000 to $17,280,000,000, the bonding authorization granted to the New York state housing finance agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases, from $16,280,000,000 to $17,280,000,000, the bonding authorization granted to the New York state housing finance agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.419
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.126
2012-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a10050
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1065
2012-05-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2012-04-09SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A10050 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6899

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback