NY A10047 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the town of Walton in the county of Delaware to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland to Bruce Taylor and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Title
Relates to authorizing the town of Walton in the county of Delaware to alienate certain parcels of land used as parkland to Bruce Taylor and to acquire other parcels of land to replace such parkland.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s7557 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.363 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.363 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07557 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.215