NY A10039 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.465
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Lauren's law requiring the commissioner of health to ask applicants about joining the donate life registry on consent applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Lauren's law requiring the commissioner of health to ask applicants about joining the donate life registry on consent applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.465
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.876
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7103A
2012-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.393
2012-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.393
2012-06-19Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-16Assemblyprint number 10039b
2012-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-06-15Assemblyprint number 10039a
2012-06-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2012-05-31Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-05-02Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07103 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10039B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10039&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10039&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10039
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10039&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10039A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10039&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10039B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10039&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A10039#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback