NY S07103 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10039B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Lauren's law requiring the commissioner of health to ask applicants about joining the donate life registry on consent applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Lauren's law requiring the commissioner of health to ask applicants about joining the donate life registry on consent applications.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A10039B
2012-06-18SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7103A
2012-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.876
2012-04-27SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A10039 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.465

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback