NY A10014 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to asbestos project notification fees per square foot for friable material.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to asbestos project notification fees per square foot for friable material.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-17Senatetabled
2014-12-17Senatevetoed memo.554
2014-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1592
2014-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7900
2014-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.341
2014-06-16Assemblyrules report cal.341
2014-06-16Assemblyreported
2014-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-10Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-06-06Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S07900 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10014

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback