NY A09975 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8815
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the liability of a person who presents false claims for money or property to the state or a local government.
Title
Relates to the liability of a person who presents false claims for money or property to the state or a local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8815 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.643 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08815 (Same As) 2022-12-29 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR