NY A09972 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.282
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners.
Title
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners.
Sponsors
Asm. Sarah Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.282 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1382 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8932 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.641 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08932 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9972