NY A09970 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the small business energy conservation ombudsman program to represent small businesses on issues relating to state energy policy and the goals of the climate leadership and community protection act.
Title
Establishes the small business energy conservation ombudsman program to represent small businesses on issues relating to state energy policy and the goals of the climate leadership and community protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.282 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | referred to small business |
Same As/Similar To
S09280 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES