NY A09969 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7861a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7861a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to elections and elective officers of new towns.
Title
Relates to elections and elective officers of new towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s7861a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.228 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-04-13 | Assembly | print number 9969a |
2018-04-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2018-03-02 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07861 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.104