NY A09969 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a waiver of half of the civil service examination fee for veterans.
Title
Grants a waiver of half of the civil service examination fee for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.317 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.317 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06375 (Same As) 2012-02-02 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS