NY A09935 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - signed chap.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - signed chap.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain information regarding judgments about an employee's inability to perform their duties due to a disability to be provided to the employee and the authorized representative of such employee.
Title
Requires certain information regarding judgments about an employee's inability to perform their duties due to a disability to be provided to the employee and the authorized representative of such employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-04 | Assembly | signed chap.306 |
2024-09-04 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1142 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8948 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.279 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.279 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-04-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08948 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9935