NY S08948 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9935
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain information regarding judgments about an employee's inability to perform their duties due to a disability to be provided to the employee and the authorized representative of such employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain information regarding judgments about an employee's inability to perform their duties due to a disability to be provided to the employee and the authorized representative of such employee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9935
2024-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1142
2024-04-02SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09935 (Same As) 2024-09-04 - signed chap.306

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback