NY A09922 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.283
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the New York state housing finance agency with respect to an increase in bond and note authorization.
Title
Relates to the powers of the New York state housing finance agency with respect to an increase in bond and note authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.283 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1515 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7149 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.231 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.231 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07149 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9922