NY A09910 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.354
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.354
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the administration of digital assets; defines terms; authorizes a user to use an online tool to direct the custodian to disclose or not to disclose some or all of the user's digital assets, including the content of electronic communications; provides that this article does not impair the rights of a custodian or a user under a terms-of-service agreement to access and use digital assets of the user; provides for a procedure for disclosing digital assets; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for the administration of digital assets; defines terms; authorizes a user to use an online tool to direct the custodian to disclose or not to disclose some or all of the user's digital assets, including the content of electronic communications; provides that this article does not impair the rights of a custodian or a user under a terms-of-service agreement to access and use digital assets of the user; provides for a procedure for disclosing digital assets; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.354 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1132 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7604A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9910a |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.717 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07604 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9910A