NY A09909 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8734
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Title
Extends the hotel and motel tax in the town of Woodbury an additional three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8734 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.724 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08734 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.456