NY A09877 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s2903a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s2903a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Title
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s2903a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.366 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.366 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | print number 9877a |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S02903 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.94