NY A09873 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs local social services districts to annually report on the caseloads of their child protective services employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs local social services districts to annually report on the caseloads of their child protective services employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatetabled
2014-12-29Senatevetoed memo.577
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1619
2014-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7524
2014-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.227
2014-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.227
2014-06-11Assemblyreported
2014-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-27Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S07524 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9873

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback