NY A09869 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s7441c
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - substituted by s7441c
Summary
Requires hospitals and birth centers to prepare and distribute an informational leaflet containing information detailing how parents or guardians of infants and children can subscribe to the United States consumer product safety commission's e-mail subscription lists to receive consumer product recall and safety news.
Title
Requires hospitals and birth centers to prepare and distribute an informational leaflet containing information detailing how parents or guardians of infants and children can subscribe to the United States consumer product safety commission's e-mail subscription lists to receive consumer product recall and safety news.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | substituted by s7441c | |
2010-06-16 | amended on third reading 9869c | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 | |
2010-06-15 | rules report cal.144 | |
2010-06-15 | reported | |
2010-06-15 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-12 | print number 9869b | |
2010-05-12 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2010-04-27 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-04-20 | print number 9869a | |
2010-04-20 | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | |
2010-02-04 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S7441 (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.539
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09869&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |