NY S07441 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.539
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hospitals and birth centers to prepare and distribute an informational leaflet containing information detailing how parents or guardians of infants and children can subscribe to the United States consumer product safety commission's e-mail subscription lists to receive consumer product recall and safety news.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hospitals and birth centers to prepare and distribute an informational leaflet containing information detailing how parents or guardians of infants and children can subscribe to the United States consumer product safety commission's e-mail subscription lists to receive consumer product recall and safety news.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-01 SIGNED CHAP.539
2010-09-20 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-23 returned to senate
2010-06-23 passed assembly
2010-06-23 ordered to third reading rules cal.144
2010-06-23 substituted for a9869c
2010-06-23 referred to ways and means
2010-06-22 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-22 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-22 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1101
2010-06-22 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-16 PRINT NUMBER 7441C
2010-06-16 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2010-05-12 PRINT NUMBER 7441B
2010-05-12 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2010-04-23 PRINT NUMBER 7441A
2010-04-23 AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2010-04-09 REFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A9869 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - substituted by s7441c

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback