NY A09833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending provisions of law relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends such date to July 1, 2022.
Title
Relates to extending provisions of law relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends such date to July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.455 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |