NY A09820 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.277
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.277
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the use of municipal space for outdoor dining and alcohol consumption.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the use of municipal space for outdoor dining and alcohol consumption.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.277 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1379 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8820A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.247 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.247 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 9820a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08820 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9820A