NY A09801 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds 2 representatives of home care agencies to the workgroup on state health information technology infrastructure.
Title
Adds 2 representatives of home care agencies to the workgroup on state health information technology infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.132 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1276 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7592 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.105 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.105 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07592 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9801