NY A09798 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8750a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8750a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to alienate certain lands used as parklands to enable Sunrise Wind, LLC to construct, maintain and operate a subterranean conduit and electrical distribution cable system, together with subterranean transition joint bays and link boxes, on county of Suffolk parkland located at Southaven County Park, Smith Point County Park and Smith Point County Marina and appurtenances thereto.
Title
Authorizes the county of Suffolk to alienate certain lands used as parklands to enable Sunrise Wind, LLC to construct, maintain and operate a subterranean conduit and electrical distribution cable system, together with subterranean transition joint bays and link boxes, on county of Suffolk parkland located at Southaven County Park, Smith Point County Park and Smith Point County Marina and appurtenances thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8750a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.719 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9798a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-04-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08750 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.779