NY A09794 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-9)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6466b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6466b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a physician, nurse practitioner, physician assistant, registered nurse, licensed practical nurse or emergency medical technician to act as a designated camp health director or to provide health services at a children's overnight, summer day, or traveling summer day camp with a permit.
Title
Authorizes a physician, nurse practitioner, physician assistant, registered nurse, licensed practical nurse or emergency medical technician to act as a designated camp health director or to provide health services at a children's overnight, summer day, or traveling summer day camp with a permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6466b |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | print number 9794a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06466 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.214