NY A09789 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.118
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment by the city of New York of a revenue stabilization fund and variations from generally accepted accounting principles as applied to the budget and accounts of such city in connection with such fund.
Title
Relates to the establishment by the city of New York of a revenue stabilization fund and variations from generally accepted accounting principles as applied to the budget and accounts of such city in connection with such fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.118 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-05-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-05-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-05-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.26 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | substituted for a9789a |
2020-05-27 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.659 |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | substituted by s8400 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.26 |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-25 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | print number 9789a |
2020-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08400 (Same As) 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.118