NY S08400 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - SIGNED CHAP.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment by the city of New York of a revenue stabilization fund and variations from generally accepted accounting principles as applied to the budget and accounts of such city in connection with such fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment by the city of New York of a revenue stabilization fund and variations from generally accepted accounting principles as applied to the budget and accounts of such city in connection with such fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.118
2020-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-05-27Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-05-27Assemblypassed assembly
2020-05-27Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.26
2020-05-27Assemblysubstituted for a9789a
2020-05-27Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-05-27SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-05-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-05-27SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.659
2020-05-26SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2020-05-25SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-05-21SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A09789 (Same As) 2020-05-27 - substituted by s8400

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback