NY A09785 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.764
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.764
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to consumer protection from deceptive acts and practices; increases damages and directs consumers on bringing an action for such deceptive acts and practices.
Title
Relates to consumer protection from deceptive acts and practices; increases damages and directs consumers on bringing an action for such deceptive acts and practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.764 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-07 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |