NY A09785 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - substituted by s6638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - substituted by s6638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the provisions of chapter 122 of 2000, from August 1, 2012 to August 1, 2015.
Title
Relates to extending the provisions of chapter 122 of 2000, from August 1, 2012 to August 1, 2015.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Assembly | substituted by s6638 |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.474 |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06638 (Same As) 2012-05-18 - SIGNED CHAP.36