NY A09767 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing an occupancy tax in the village of Medina in Orleans county not to exceed two percent of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to authorizing an occupancy tax in the village of Medina in Orleans county not to exceed two percent of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.629 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.629 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | print number 9767a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03643 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - PRINT NUMBER 3643A