NY A09749 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain prospective employees of the department of education have a criminal background check conducted on them.
Title
Provides that certain prospective employees of the department of education have a criminal background check conducted on them.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.576 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.696 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5356 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.412 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05356 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9749