NY A09718 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.1020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - advanced to third reading cal.1020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to attachment to the labor market in temporary partial disability cases.
Title
Relates to attachment to the labor market in temporary partial disability cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1020 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03922 (Same As) 2018-04-06 - PRINT NUMBER 3922A