NY A09696 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires statements made to the state board of parole by the victim of a crime be considered when determining whether to grant a discretionary release on parole.
Title
Requires statements made to the state board of parole by the victim of a crime be considered when determining whether to grant a discretionary release on parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.130 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1579 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7224 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.712 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-04-01 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07224 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9696