NY A09692 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - advanced to third reading cal.811
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to food service waste reduction; prohibits the use of polystyrene foam by contractors and lessees who deal with the state through state and municipal contracts.
Title
Relates to food service waste reduction; prohibits the use of polystyrene foam by contractors and lessees who deal with the state through state and municipal contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.811 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04168 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION