NY A09691 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain municipal and state agencies to provide requested information to the office of victim services unless such information is otherwise protected from disclosure or prohibited by superseding laws or would interfere with ongoing criminal investigations.
Title
Requires certain municipal and state agencies to provide requested information to the office of victim services unless such information is otherwise protected from disclosure or prohibited by superseding laws or would interfere with ongoing criminal investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07117 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION