NY A09668 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-01 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-01 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provisional certification for certain minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Title
Relates to provisional certification for certain minority and women-owned business enterprises.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Francisco Moya [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Karim Camara [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-01 | Senate | signed chap.399 |
2014-09-29 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1646 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7314 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.484 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.484 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07314 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9668