NY A09651 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.325
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - signed chap.325
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a tax exemption for certain energy systems; includes fuel-flexible linear generator among other energy systems which are exempt from taxation.
Title
Authorizes a tax exemption for certain energy systems; includes fuel-flexible linear generator among other energy systems which are exempt from taxation.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-05 | Senate | signed chap.325 |
2018-10-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.399 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7418B |
2018-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.179 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.179 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 9651b |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | print number 9651a |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07418 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9651B