NY A09643 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the portion of public pension fund assets that may be invested according to the prudent investor standard.
Title
Increases the portion of public pension fund assets that may be invested according to the prudent investor standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.552 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.995 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7331A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.316 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.316 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 9643a |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07331 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9643A