NY A09632 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires at least $8,500,000 credited to the spinal cord injury research trust fund from the mandatory surcharges and crime victim assistance fees required in certain vehicle and traffic cases.
Title
Requires at least $8,500,000 credited to the spinal cord injury research trust fund from the mandatory surcharges and crime victim assistance fees required in certain vehicle and traffic cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1403 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9144 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.273 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.273 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S09144 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9632