NY A09621 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all agencies to submit to the committee on open government a log of all freedom of information law requests for each year in which they received or have pending a request for records; requires the committee on open government to publish, on one webpage, all freedom of information law request logs it receives.
Title
Requires all agencies to submit to the committee on open government a log of all freedom of information law requests for each year in which they received or have pending a request for records; requires the committee on open government to publish, on one webpage, all freedom of information law request logs it receives.
Sponsors
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Asm. Karen McMahon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9621a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.416 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08671 (Same As) 2024-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 8671A