NY A09605 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-17)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "tourism economic development fund" to be funded with revenue from the licensing of the "I Love NY" brand; moneys from such fund shall be appropriated for the promotion, attraction, stimulation, development and expansion of tourist travel, resort, vacation, culture and convention activities in this state.
Title
Establishes the "tourism economic development fund" to be funded with revenue from the licensing of the "I Love NY" brand; moneys from such fund shall be appropriated for the promotion, attraction, stimulation, development and expansion of tourist travel, resort, vacation, culture and convention activities in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s6663 |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.707 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-20 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S06663 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.169