NY S06663 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "tourism economic development fund" to be funded with revenue from the licensing of the "I Love NY" brand; moneys from such fund shall be appropriated for the promotion, attraction, stimulation, development and expansion of tourist travel, resort, vacation, culture and convention activities in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "tourism economic development fund" to be funded with revenue from the licensing of the "I Love NY" brand; moneys from such fund shall be appropriated for the promotion, attraction, stimulation, development and expansion of tourist travel, resort, vacation, culture and convention activities in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyVETOED MEMO.169
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.707
2012-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a9605
2012-04-18Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2012-04-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-04-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-03-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-03-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.379
2012-03-08SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A09605 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6663

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback