NY A09601 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - substituted by s8417b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-04 - substituted by s8417b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination based on status as a victim of domestic violence.
Title
Prohibits discrimination based on status as a victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | substituted by s8417b |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.91 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.91 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | print number 9601b |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | print number 9601a |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08417 (Same As) 2022-05-13 - SIGNED CHAP.202